Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Cresi

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1733³Born
24 Sep 175724.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179258.3SelectedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
26 Mar 179258.5ConfirmedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
9 Apr 179258.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
22 Sep 180471.0DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cresi
Bishop Antonio Cresi (born , died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL’Aquila

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 320
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018