Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Ludovici (Ludovico), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1747BornEboli
28 Apr 177124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
20 Jan 179244.7SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
26 Mar 179244.9ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
9 Apr 179244.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
24 Oct 179750.5SelectedBishop of Policastro, Italy
18 Dec 179750.6ConfirmedBishop of Policastro, Italy
17 Jan 181971.7DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Ludovici (Ludovico)
Bishop Ludovico Ludovici (Ludovico) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 343
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016