Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio Michele Cardinal Crivelli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1698Born
16 Aug 173940.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Aug 173940.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 173941.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
4 Oct 173941.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
10 Sep 174041.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
7 Mar 174445.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
9 Apr 174445.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
10 Feb 175455.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Jul 1754³55.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
24 Sep 175960.9Elevated to Cardinal
Jul 1760³61.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
17 Aug 176162.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
29 Feb 176869.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Michele Crivelli (VIAF: 89086555)
Ignazio Michele Cardinal Crivelli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Chapel, S. Maria alla Porta, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
  • a cardinal for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 32
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018