Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Maria (Pietro Felice) Varano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1735Born
22 Oct 175822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Feb 179256.2SelectedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
18 Jun 179256.5ConfirmedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
24 Jun 179256.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
9 Dec 180368.0DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Maria (Pietro Felice) Varano
Bishop Lorenzo Maria (Pietro Felice) Varano O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsca

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast