Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Andriani

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1739Born
18 Dec 176223.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179252.5SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
18 Jun 179252.8ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
24 Jun 179252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
1795¹55.3DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Andriani
Bishop Agostino Andriani (born , died 1795) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,792, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast