Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Brunone Fazzi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1726³BornCalci
1 Mar 174923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
12 Jul 177953.3AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
18 Jul 177953.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
22 Jan 180679.9DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Brunone Fazzi:
Bishop Francesco Brunone Fazzi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015