Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Crispo Doria

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1735Born
23 Dec 175823.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179156.3SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
27 Feb 179256.5ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
4 Mar 179256.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
5 Aug 180065.0DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Crispo Doria
Bishop Ferdinando Crispo Doria (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,792, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast