Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Gioannetti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1722BornBologna
19 Dec 174422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jan 177654.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
29 Jan 177654.0AppointedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy
4 Feb 177654.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
23 Jun 177755.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 177755.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 177755.9AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
30 Mar 177856.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
8 Apr 180078.2DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Gioannetti:
Andrea Cardinal Gioannetti O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015