Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Criscuolo

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1739³Born
5 Jun 176222.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179152.4SelectedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
27 Feb 179252.6ConfirmedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
4 Mar 179252.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
1793¹53.5DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Criscuolo
Bishop Bartolomeo Criscuolo (born , died 1793) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellamare

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018