Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Nicola Maria Fabi Borsella, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1721BornViadana
19 Dec 174423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
17 Sep 178159.9AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
23 Sep 178159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
16 Mar 180381.4DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Nicola Maria Fabi Borsella:
Bishop Carlo Nicola Maria Fabi Borsella O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125
  • c34/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016