Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Sciarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1731³Born
3 Apr 175625.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 178251.9AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
22 Dec 178251.9Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
26 Jan 180170.0DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Sciarelli
Bishop Niccolò Sciarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,782, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast