Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Martino Bernardoni Baccolo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1752BornVenezia
12 Nov 177523.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 178936.4AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
19 Apr 178936.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
5 Jun 179340.6ResignedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
18 Jun 179340.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
1 Jun 179542.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
12 Oct 182370.9DiedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Martino Bernardoni Baccolo:
Bishop Giovanni Martino Bernardoni Baccolo (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 156, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013