Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Corari

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1749BornRoma
10 Apr 177324.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 178940.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
3 Aug 178940.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
9 Aug 178940.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
181969.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joseph Corari
Bishop Joseph Corari (born , died 1819) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016