Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Martini

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1720BornPrato
18 Sep 174525.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 178161.1AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
1 Jul 178161.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
31 Dec 180989.6DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Martini:
Archbishop Antonio Martini (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015