Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giovanni Scutellari Ajani

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1742Born
31 Mar 177027.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 179350.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
24 Jun 179350.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
18 Jul 182683.5DiedTitular Bishop of Ioppe

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giovanni Scutellari Ajani
Bishop Francesco Giovanni Scutellari Ajani (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ioppe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Italy

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,916
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,925
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,793, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast