Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Belloni

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1740Born
15 Aug 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 179453.9AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
21 Sep 179454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
22 Jul 180059.8DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Belloni
Bishop Carlo Belloni (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCodogno

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,794, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast