Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Mancinforte

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1733BornAncona
28 Oct 176329.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 178753.4AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
6 May 178753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
20 Feb 180571.2DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Mancinforte:
Bishop Domenico Mancinforte (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,924
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013