Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo de Dominicis

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1735BornFoligno
23 Sep 175823.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 178751.7AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
13 May 178751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
1 Jan 182286.3DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo de Dominicis
Bishop Lorenzo de Dominicis (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167, and Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016