Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Gabriele Cardinal Severoli

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1757Born
18 Dec 177922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
23 Apr 178730.1AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
13 May 178730.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
28 Sep 180144.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fano, Italy
28 Sep 180144.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
Oct 1801³44.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
6 Aug 180649.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
11 Jan 180850.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
8 Mar 181659.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Oct 181760.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
8 Sep 182467.5DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gabriele Severoli (VIAF: 89058792)
Antonio Gabriele Cardinal Severoli (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Diocese of Faenza
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 303, and Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 7
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast