Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Marcacci

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1739³Born
19 Sep 176122.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 177131.5AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
10 Mar 177131.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
14 Dec 177839.3AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
1 Jan 179959.4DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Marcacci
Bishop Niccolò Marcacci (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cassiano

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99, and Page 135
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast