Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filiberto Pascali (Pascale)

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1722BornSan Vito
17 Apr 174523.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 177149.6AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
29 Sep 177149.7Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
20 Feb 178866.1DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filiberto Pascali (Pascale):
Bishop Filiberto Pascali (Pascale) (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015