Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Banditi, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1706BornRimini
19 Dec 172317.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
14 Aug 172922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 Mar 177265.6AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
5 Apr 177265.6Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
26 May 177568.7ResignedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
29 May 177568.7AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
17 Jul 177568.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Nov 177569.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 177569.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
27 Jan 179689.4DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Banditi:
Cardinal Francesco Maria Banditi C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jul 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013