Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saverio Palica, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1714³BornBarletta
1737¹22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Mar 177359.0AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
14 Mar 177359.0Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
8 Apr 179177.1DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Saverio Palica:
Bishop Saverio Palica O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015