Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassarre Vulcano, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1729BornSorrento
14 Feb 174516.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jan 175222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jul 177142.5AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
4 Aug 177142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Mar 177344.1DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Baldassarre Vulcano:
Bishop Baldassarre Vulcano O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013