Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1718Born
9 Mar 174324.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 177254.5SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
14 Dec 177254.6ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
20 Dec 177254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
14 May 178163.0DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Pisani
Bishop Salvatore Pisani (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGioiosa

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018