Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Díaz de La Guerra

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1726Born
17 Dec 175731.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 177245.9AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
28 Jun 177245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
23 Jun 177750.9AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
29 Sep 180074.2DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Díaz de La Guerra
Bishop Juan Díaz de La Guerra (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJerez de la Frontera

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,697
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273, and Page 374
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 89, Number 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018