Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthus Maria Barberio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bitetto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1706³Born
8 May 172923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Mar 177165.1AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
10 Mar 177165.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
1 Jan 179891.9DiedBishop of Bitetto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthus Maria Barberio
Bishop Hyacinthus Maria Barberio O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Bitetto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Germano

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018