Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michał Jerzy Poniatowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1736BornGdańsk
22 Mar 176023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 176023.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 177336.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
12 Jul 177336.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
3 Oct 177336.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
3 Apr 177538.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kraków, Poland
9 Aug 178346.8SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
14 Feb 178548.3AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
12 Aug 179457.8DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Michał Jerzy Poniatowski (VIAF: 17525359)
Archbishop Michał Jerzy Poniatowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 186
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016