Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliks Paweł Turski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1729BornCzarnocen
10 Feb 175425.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Feb 175425.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 176536.0SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
22 Apr 176536.2ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
16 Jun 176536.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jul 177041.5SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
4 Mar 177142.1ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
2 Jun 179061.3SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
29 Nov 179061.8ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
31 Mar 180071.2DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Feliks Paweł Turski:
Bishop Feliks Paweł Turski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 186
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,650
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015