Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Szyjkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1721³BornOstroleka
8 Jun 175432.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Jun 175432.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177554.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
13 Nov 177554.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
26 May 177654.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
1797¹75.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Szyjkowski: VIAF:311393178
Bishop Jan Szyjkowski (born , died 1797) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 381, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,896
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1776, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015