Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Erazm Wołłowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1711³BornGosławice
29 Apr 173826.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 173826.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 175543.4SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
12 May 175543.6ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
8 Jun 175543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
6 Jul 177058.7DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Erazm Wołłowicz:
Bishop Anton Erazm Wołłowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015