Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Kobielski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1724¹Born
28 Jan 176036.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
28 Jan 176036.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
13 Apr 176036.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
1 May 176642.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Kobielski
Bishop Franciszek Kobielski (born 1724, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast