Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Kandyd Ossoliński, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1732³BornPoznań
9 Mar 175422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Feb 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
5 Jan 176532.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Bacău, Romania
22 Apr 176533.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Bacău, Romania
22 Apr 176533.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
13 Oct 176533.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
11 Oct 177341.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
20 Dec 177341.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
7 Jan 177441.9SucceededBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
7 Aug 178452.5DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Kandyd Ossoliński:
Bishop Franciszek Kandyd Ossoliński O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015