Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wacław Hieronim Sierakowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1700³Born
30 Jun 172625.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 173737.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
30 Sep 173737.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
4 May 173837.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
9 Sep 173838.0SucceededBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
16 Nov 173939.2AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
25 May 174241.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Jul 176059.8AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
25 Oct 178080.1DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wacław Hieronim Sierakowski
Archbishop Wacław Hieronim Sierakowski (born Sep 1700, died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaba

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 161, and Page 435
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 259, and Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1738, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017