Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Piotr Karwosiecki, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1728³BornZamosc
10 Apr 175122.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 May 177445.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bacău, Romania
9 May 177445.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
1 Jan 177546.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
28 Apr 178253.7SucceededBishop of Bacău, Romania
30 Sep 178961.1DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominik Piotr Karwosiecki:
Bishop Dominik Piotr Karwosiecki O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Bacău

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 122
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013