Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kryspin Cieszkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Titular Bishop of Nyssa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1730BornAdamowicz
21 Apr 175322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Apr 175827.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177242.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
14 Dec 177242.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
18 Apr 177342.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
1792¹61.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kryspin Cieszkowski:
Bishop Kryspin Cieszkowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 316, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,609
  • ob: CB, 2 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Sep 2014