Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Rajmund Jezierski, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1697³Born
23 Sep 171922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Sep 172023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Feb 173436.7SelectedBishop of Bacău, Romania
20 Dec 173740.6ConfirmedBishop of Bacău, Romania
4 May 173840.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
28 Apr 178284.9DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Rajmund Jezierski
Bishop Stanisław Rajmund Jezierski O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Bacău

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLukowiecz

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1738, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jan 2017