Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Józef Kiełczewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chełm

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1702BornGniezno
26 Aug 173128.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jul 176057.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
21 Jul 176057.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
14 Oct 176057.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
14 Jul 177572.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
28 Feb 177673.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chełm, Poland

MicroData Summary for Dominik Józef Kiełczewski:
Bishop Dominik Józef Kiełczewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chełm

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234, and Page 453
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,048
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015