Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronim Wieloglowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1703³BornKrakow
22 May 172723.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 176057.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Sep 176057.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
28 Jun 176157.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
Jan 1767²63.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronim Wieloglowski:
Bishop Hieronim Wieloglowski (born , died Jan 1767) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,458
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015