Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Wodzicki

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1687³BornKrakow
19 Sep 171123.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 176072.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Apr 176173.5Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Jan 176476.2DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Wodzicki:
Bishop Michael Wodzicki (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015