Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Podkański, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1708³BornPotworovii
1733¹24.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
1733¹24.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 175344.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
23 Jul 175344.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
29 Sep 1753³44.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
31 Mar 178677.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
11 Jul 178980.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Podkański:
Bishop Franciszek Podkański S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,648
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015