Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Gorczyński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1698³Born
19 Dec 172224.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Feb 172325.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 176971.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Dec 176971.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
29 Apr 177072.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
11 Aug 177072.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antoni Gorczyński
Bishop Antoni Gorczyński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBialen

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,607
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1770, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018