Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Głowiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1703³Born
27 Dec 172522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Feb 172623.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173330.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
2 Dec 173330.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
1734¹30.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
14 Sep 177673.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Głowiński
Bishop Samuel Głowiński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiatofranig

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017