Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonin Kornel Przedwojewski, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Bolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1732¹BornChelmen
19 Sep 176836.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
19 Sep 176836.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
23 Oct 176836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
3 Aug 179361.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonin Kornel Przedwojewski:
Bishop Antonin Kornel Przedwojewski O.F.M. Cap. (born 1732, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,252
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015