Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kasper Józef Szajowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Laranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1726³BornPalameen
30 Jul 175226.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Aug 175226.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 178155.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
10 Dec 178155.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
19 May 178256.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
26 Jun 180276.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kasper Józef Szajowski:
Bishop Kasper Józef Szajowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016