Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cypriano de São José, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1743Born
21 Dec 176825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
21 Oct 179652.9SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
24 Jul 179753.6ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
31 Dec 179754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
14 Aug 181773.7DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cypriano de São José
Bishop Cypriano de São José O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Portugal

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018