Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gomes de Avelar, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1739BornCalhandriz
17 Sep 175718.6ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
26 Feb 176324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Feb 178950.0SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Mar 178950.2ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
26 Apr 178950.2Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Dec 181677.9DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gomes de Avelar
Bishop Francisco Gomes de Avelar C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 335
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,081
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016