Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Custodio de Santa Ana d’Almeida, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1748BornPorto, Portugal
1 Jun 177729.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Agostiniani Scalzi
6 Jun 177729.1Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
22 Oct 180456.5SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
26 Jun 180557.2ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
10 Nov 180557.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
23 Mar 181263.9DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Custodio de Santa Ana d’Almeida:
Bishop Custodio de Santa Ana d’Almeida O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,084
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013