Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João da Purificação Marques Perdigão, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1779BornVianna do Minho
21 Oct 183051.6SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
28 Feb 183152.0ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
26 May 183354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
30 Apr 186485.2DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João da Purificação Marques Perdigão:
Bishop João da Purificação Marques Perdigão O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013