Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Antônio de Souza

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1771BornBahia
25 Jun 182756.3AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
28 Oct 182756.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
29 Nov 184271.8DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcos Antônio de Souza
Bishop Marcos Antônio de Souza (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016